District Judge (Magistrates' Court)
-
April 23, 2021
District Judge (Magistrates’ courts) Retirement: Blake
District Judge (Magistrates’ courts) Richard Andrew Blake retired with effect from 17 April 2021. Background information District Judge (Magistrates’ courts) Blake (66) was called to the Bar (G) in 1982. He was appointed an Acting Metropolitan Stipendiary Magistrate (now known as a Deputy District Judge (Magistrates’ courts)) in 1999 and a District Judge (Magistrates’ courts) […]
-
April 8, 2021
District Judge (Magistrates’ courts) Retirement: Green
District Judge (Magistrates’ courts) Susan Valerie Green retired with effect from 7 April 2021. Background information District Judge (Magistrates’ courts) Green (66) was admitted as a Solicitor in 1981. She was appointed an Acting Metropolitan Stipendiary Magistrate (now known as a Deputy District Judge (Magistrates’ courts)) in 1998 and a District Judge (Magistrates’ courts) in […]
-
April 1, 2021
District Judge (Magistrates’ courts) Retirement: Daber
District Judge (Magistrates’ courts) Timothy Mark Daber retires with effect from 1 April 2021. Background information District Judge (Magistrates’ courts) Daber (63) was called to the Bar (G) in 1981. He was appointed a Deputy District Judge (Magistrates’ courts) in 2000 and a District Judge (Magistrates’ courts) in 2007.
-
December 1, 2020
District Judge (Magistrates’ courts) Retirement: Bopa Rai
District Judge (Magistrates’ courts) Aprampar Apar Jot Kaur Bopa Rai retired with effect from 1 December 2020. Background information District Judge (Magistrates’ courts) Bopa Rai (63) was admitted as a Solicitor in 1984. She was appointed a Deputy District Judge (Magistrates’ courts) in 2000 and a District Judge (Magistrates’ courts) in 2004.
-
November 27, 2020
District Judge (Magistrates’ courts) Retirement: Chalk
District Judge (Magistrates’ courts) Gerald Anthony Chalk retires with effect from 27 November 2020. Background information District Judge (Magistrates’ courts) Chalk (70) was admitted as a Solicitor in 1978. He was appointed a Deputy District Judge (Magistrates’ courts) in 1999 and a District Judge (Magistrates’ courts) in 2004.
-
August 5, 2020
District Judge (Magistrates’ courts) Retirement: Lachhar
District Judge (Magistrates’ courts) Davinder Kaur Lachhar retired with effect from 2 July 2020. Notes to editors District Judge (Magistrates’ courts) Lachhar (65) was called to the Bar (M) in 1978. She was appointed a District Judge (Magistrates’ courts) in 1996 and a Recorder in 2009.
-
July 18, 2020
District Judge (Magistrates’ courts) Retirement: Davison
District Judge (Magistrates’ courts) Neil Davison retires with effect from 18 July 2020. Notes to editors District Judge (Magistrates’ courts) Davison (69) was admitted as a Solicitor in 1977. He was appointed a Deputy District Judge (Magistrates’ courts) in 1999 and a District Judge (Magistrates’ courts) in 2005.
-
June 25, 2020
District Judge (Magistrates’ courts) Retirement: Taylor
District Judge (Magistrates’ courts) David William Taylor retires with effect from 25 June 2020. Notes to editors District Judge (Magistrates’ courts) Taylor (63) was admitted as a Solicitor in 1982. He was appointed a Legal Member of the Mental Health Review Tribunal (now known as a Judge of the first-tier Tribunal (Health, Education and Social […]
-
April 11, 2020
District Judge (Magistrates’ courts) Retirement: Clark
District Judge (Magistrates’ courts) Paul Anthony Mason Clark retires with effect from 11 April 2020. Notes to editors District Judge (Magistrates’ courts) Clark (67) was called to the Bar (M) in 1975. He was appointed an Acting Stipendiary Magistrate (Magistrates’ courts) in 1994, and a Metropolitan Stipendiary Magistrate (now known as District Judge (Magistrates’ courts) […]
-
March 20, 2020
District Judge (Magistrates’ courts) Appointment: Layton
The Queen has appointed Jonathan Mark Layton to be a District Judge (Magistrates’ courts) on the advice of the Lord Chancellor, the Right Honourable Robert Buckland QC MP and the Lord Chief Justice of England and Wales, the Right Honourable The Lord Burnett of Maldon. The Lord Chief Justice has deployed him to the South […]