First-Tier Tribunal Judge
-
March 1, 2021
Judge of the First-tier Tribunal, Property Chamber Retirement: McAllister
Judge Elizabeth Ann McAllister retires with effect from 1 March 2021. Notes to editors Judge McAllister (66) was called to the Bar in 1982. She was appointed a Recorder in 2003, a part-time Adjudicator to HM Land Registry in 2005 and a full-time Adjudicator to HM Land Registry (now known as a Judge of the […]
-
March 1, 2021
Judge of the First-tier Tribunal, Property Chamber Retirement: Rhys
Judge John Owen Rhys retires with effect from 1 March 2021. Notes to editors Judge Rhys (68) was called to the Bar (G) in 1976. He was appointed a Deputy Chancery Master in 2000, a part-time Adjudicator to HM Land Registry in 2005 and a full-time Adjudicator to HM Land Registry (now known as a […]
-
March 1, 2021
Judge of the First-tier Tribunal (Immigration and Asylum Chamber) Retirement: Lever
Judge John Lever retires with effect from 1 March 2021. Notes to editors Judge Lever (64) was called to the Bar (M) in 1978. He was appointed a Recorder and part-time Immigration Adjudicator in 2001 and a full-time Immigration Adjudicator (now known as a Judge of the First-tier Tribunal (Immigration and Asylum Chamber) in 2003. […]
-
November 5, 2020
Judge of the First-tier Tribunal (Social Entitlement Chamber) Retirement: Taylor
Judge Michael Alan Taylor retires with effect from 5 November 2020. Notes to editors Judge Taylor (66) was admitted as a Solicitor in 1982. He was appointed a Legally Qualified Panel Member of the Appeals Tribunal in 1993 and a District Chairman of the Appeals Tribunal (now known as a Judge of the First-tier Tribunal […]
-
November 4, 2020
Judge of the First-tier Tribunal (Immigration and Asylum Chamber) Retirement: Robertson
Judge Manjinder Robertson retired with effect from 1 November 2020. Notes to editors Judge Robertson (61) was admitted as a Solicitor in 1987. She was appointed a Legally Qualified Panel Member of the Appeals Tribunal (now known as a Judge of the First-tier Tribunal (Social Entitlement Chamber) in 2001 and a Lawyer Chairman of the […]
-
October 23, 2020
Judge of the First-tier Tribunal (Immigration and Asylum Chamber) Retirement: Gibb
Judge Jeremy Roderick Gibb retired with effect from 23 October 2020. Notes to editors Judge Gibb (58) was called to the Bar (M) in 1989. He was appointed a part-time Immigration Adjudicator in 1999, a salaried Immigration Adjudicator (now known as a Judge of the First-tier Tribunal (Immigration and Asylum Chamber) in 2002 and a […]
-
August 1, 2020
Judge of the First-tier Tribunal, Social Entitlement Chamber (Social Security and Child Support) Retirement: Forrest
Judge Robert Kerr Forrest retires with effect from 1 August 2020. Notes to editors Judge Forrest (65) was admitted as a Solicitor in 1977. He was appointed a District Chairman of Appeal Tribunals in 1999 now known as a Judge of the First-tier Tribunal, Social Entitlement Chamber (Social Security and Child Support) in 2008.
-
June 1, 2020
Judge of the First-tier Tribunal, Social Entitlement Chamber (Social Security and Child Support) Retirement: Marston
Judge John Marston retires with effect from 1 June 2020. Notes to editors Judge Marston (67) was admitted as a Solicitor in 1977. He was appointed a Legally Qualified Panel Member of Appeal Tribunals in 1999 and a Judge of the First-tier Tribunal, Social Entitlement Chamber (Social Security and Child Support) in 2009.
-
June 1, 2020
Judge of the First-tier Tribunal, Social Entitlement Chamber (Social Security and Child Support) Retirement: Veitch
Judge Andrew Veitch retires with effect from 1 June 2020. Notes to editors Judge Veitch (66) was admitted as a Solicitor in 1979 and called to the Bar in 1989. He was appointed a Legally Qualified Panel Member of Appeal Tribunals in 1993 and a Judge of the First-tier Tribunal, Social Entitlement Chamber (Social Security […]
-
May 26, 2020
Appointment as a Judge of the First-tier Tribunal, Social Entitlement Chamber: McDade
Jennifer Helen McDade has been appointed as a Judge of the First-tier Tribunal by the Senior President of Tribunals, the Right Honourable Sir Ernest Ryder. The Senior President of Tribunals has assigned her to the Social Entitlement Chamber with effect from 1 July 2020. Notes to editors Jennifer Helen McDade aged 35, will be known […]