First-Tier Tribunal Judge
-
November 1, 2019
Appointment as a Judge of the First Tier Tribunal, Tax Chamber: Sukul
Kheemelia Sukul has been appointed as a Judge of the First Tier Tribunal on the advice of The Senior President of Tribunals, the Right Honourable Sir Ernest Ryder. The Senior President of Tribunals has assigned her to the Tax Chamber with effect from 18th November 2019. Notes to editors Kheemelia Sukul, aged 44 will be […]
-
November 1, 2019
Judge of the First-tier Tribunal (Immigration and Asylum Chamber) Retirement: Conway
Judge Donald Hugh Stevenson Conway retires with effect from 1 November 2019. Notes to editors Judge Conway (65) was admitted as a Solicitor in 1980 and called to the Bar in 1991. He was appointed an Immigration Adjudicator in 1996 and a Senior Immigration Judge in 2005 (now known as a Judge of the First-tier […]
-
October 2, 2019
Judge of the First-tier Tribunal (Social Entitlement Chamber) Retirement: Ramsay
Judge Ann Ramsay retired with effect from 1 October 2019. Notes to editors Judge Ramsay was admitted as a Solicitor in 1979. She was appointed a part-time Chairman of Social Security Appeal Tribunals in 1984 and a full-time Chairman of Social Security Appeal Tribunals in 1992. She was appointed a District Chairman of Appeal Tribunals […]
-
August 18, 2019
Judge of the First-tier Tribunal (Immigration and Asylum Chamber) Retirement: Chambers
Judge Paul Victor Chambers retires with effect from 18 August 2019. Notes to editors Judge Chambers (71) was called to the Bar (G) in 1973. He was appointed a fee-paid Immigration Adjudicator in 2000, a salaried Immigration Adjudicator in 2003 and an Immigration Judge in 2005 (now known as a Judge of the First-tier Tribunal […]
-
August 3, 2019
Judge of the First-tier Tribunal (Immigration and Asylum Chamber) Retirement: Pedro
Judge Stephen Alan Pedro retires with effect from 3 August 2019. Notes to editors Judge Pedro (65) was admitted as a Solicitor in 1978. He was appointed a part-time Immigration Adjudicator in 1995, a part-time Special Immigration Adjudicator in 1996 and an Immigration Judge in 2001 (now known as a Judge of the First-tier Tribunal […]
-
August 1, 2019
Judge of the First-tier Tribunal (Social Entitlement Chamber) Retirement: Lunney
Judge James Thomas Lunney retires with effect from 1 August 2019. Notes to editors Judge Lunney (65) was admitted as a Solicitor in 1981. He was appointed a Legally Qualified Panel Member of Appeal Tribunals in 1991 and a District Chairman of Appeal Tribunals in 1995 (now known as a Judge of the First-tier Tribunal […]
-
July 26, 2019
Judge of the First-tier Tribunal (Social Entitlement Chamber) Retirement: Neary
Judge Nigel Howard Neary retires with effect from 26 July 2019. Notes to editors Judge Neary (66) was admitted as a Solicitor in 1978. He was appointed a part-time Chairman of Social Security Appeal Tribunals in 1997 and a Legally Qualified Panel Member of Appeal Tribunals in 2004 (now known as a Fee-paid Judge of […]
-
July 8, 2019
Judge of the First-tier Tribunal, Social Entitlement Chamber (Social Security and Child Support): May
Judge Elizabeth Clare May retires with effect from 8 July 2019. Notes to editors Judge May (65) was admitted as a Solicitor in 1980. She was appointed a Legal Chairman of the Special Educational Needs and Disability Tribunal in 1996 (now known as a Judge of the First-tier Tribunal, Health, Education and Social Care Chamber). […]
-
June 1, 2019
Judge of the First-tier Tribunal (Social Entitlement Chamber) Retirement: Turrell
Judge David Paul Stewart Turrell retires with effect from 1 June 2019. Notes to editors Judge Turrell (69) was called to the Bar in 1981. He was appointed a part-time Chairman of Social Security Appeal Tribunals in 1987 and a full-time Chairman of Social Security Appeal Tribunals in 1993. He was appointed a District Chairman […]
-
June 1, 2019
Judge of the First-tier Tribunal (Immigration and Asylum Chamber) Retirement: Grimmett
Judge Jill Grimmett retires with effect from 1 June 2019. Notes to editors Judge Grimmett was admitted as a Solicitor in 1978. She was appointed a Deputy District Judge in 1989 and an Immigration Judge in 2005 (now known as a Judge of the First-tier Tribunal (Immigration and Asylum Chamber).