President
-
August 10, 2022
Appointment of New President of Welsh Tribunals
The Lord Chief Justice, following consultation with the First Minister of Wales and Lord Chancellor, has announced the appointment of a new President of Welsh Tribunals. Sir Gary Hickinbottom will be appointed for a period of four years, with effect from 1 April 2023, when he will succeed Sir Wyn Williams. Background: Sir Gary Robert […]
-
March 1, 2022
President Of The Upper Tribunal Tax And Chancery Chamber: Bacon
The Senior President of Tribunals, Sir Keith Lindblom, has appointed The Honourable Mrs Justice Bacon to be President of the Upper Tribunal Tax and Chancery Chamber. She took up post on 21 February 2022 and succeeds The Honourable Mr Justice Zacaroli who stood down from the role on 20 February 2022. Notes to editors The […]
-
February 17, 2022
Appointment of the President Of The Employment Appeal Tribunal: Eady
The LCJ has appointed Mrs Justice Eady to be President of the Employment Appeal Tribunal
-
November 5, 2021
Appointment of President of the Competition Appeal Tribunal: Marcus Smith
The Lord Chancellor, the Right Honourable Dominic Raab MP, has appointed The Honourable Mr Justice Marcus Smith to be President of the Competition Appeal Tribunal with effect from 5 November 2021. Mr Justice Marcus Smith replaces The Honourable Mr Justice Roth who retired as President of the Competition Appeal Tribunal on 4 November 2021. Background […]
-
August 14, 2021
President of the General Regulatory Chamber Retirement: McKenna
Judge Alison Jayne McKenna retires as President of the General Regulatory Chamber of the First-tier Tribunal with effect from 14 August 2021. Background information Judge McKenna (57) was called to the Bar (Middle Temple) in 1988 and admitted as a Solicitor in 2003. She was appointed as a Legal Member of the Mental Health Review […]
-
May 10, 2020
President of the Social Entitlement Chamber Retirement: Aitken
Judge John Russell Aitken retires as President of the Social Entitlement Chamber of the First-tier Tribunal with effect from 10 May 2020. Notes to editors Judge Aitken (63) was called to the Bar (G) in 1984. He was appointed a Recorder in 2000, a part-time Immigration Adjudicator in 2002, full-time Immigration Adjudicator in 2003, Designated Immigration […]
-
May 9, 2020
President of the Employment Tribunals (England and Wales) Retirement: Doyle
Judge Brian John Doyle retires with effect from 9 May 2020. Notes to editors Judge Doyle (65) was called to the Bar (I) in 1977. He was appointed a fee-paid Chairman of Employment Tribunals in 1994 and a salaried Chairman of Employment Tribunals in 2000. He was appointed a Regional Employment Judge and Legal Chairman […]
-
April 1, 2020
Retirement of the Deputy Vice-President of Tribunals and President of the First-tier Tribunal (Health, Education and Social Care Chamber): His Honour Judge Phillip Sycamore
His Honour Judge Phillip Sycamore retires as the Deputy Vice-President of Tribunals, President (First-tier Tribunal Health, Education and Social Care Chamber) and a Circuit Judge with effect from 1 April 2020. Notes to editors His Honour Judge Sycamore (69) was admitted as a Solicitor in 1975. He was appointed an Assistant Recorder in 1994, was […]
-
March 4, 2020
Appointment of the President of the Employment Tribunals (England and Wales)
The Lord Chancellor, the Right Honourable Robert Buckland QC, MP has appointed Judge Barry Clarke to be President of the Employment Tribunals (England and Wales) with effect from 11 May 2020. Notes to editors Barry James Clarke will continue to be known as Judge Barry Clarke. He was admitted as a Solicitor in 1996. He […]
-