Retirement
-
August 5, 2020
District Judge (Magistrates’ courts) Retirement: Lachhar
District Judge (Magistrates’ courts) Davinder Kaur Lachhar retired with effect from 2 July 2020. Notes to editors District Judge (Magistrates’ courts) Lachhar (65) was called to the Bar (M) in 1978. She was appointed a District Judge (Magistrates’ courts) in 1996 and a Recorder in 2009.
-
August 1, 2020
District Bench Retirement: Conway
District Judge Helen Lois Conway retires from the District Bench with effect from 1 August 2020. Notes to editors District Judge Conway (49) was called to the Bar (L) in 1999. She was appointed a Deputy District Judge in 2005 and a District Judge in 2010.
-
August 1, 2020
Judge of the First-tier Tribunal, Social Entitlement Chamber (Social Security and Child Support) Retirement: Forrest
Judge Robert Kerr Forrest retires with effect from 1 August 2020. Notes to editors Judge Forrest (65) was admitted as a Solicitor in 1977. He was appointed a District Chairman of Appeal Tribunals in 1999 now known as a Judge of the First-tier Tribunal, Social Entitlement Chamber (Social Security and Child Support) in 2008.
-
July 31, 2020
Senior Circuit Judge Retirement: Brown
His Honour Judge (Laurence Frederick) Mark Brown retired as a Senior Circuit Judge with effect from 27 July 2020. Notes to editors His Honour Judge Brown (67) was called to the Bar (I) in 1975 and was elected a Bencher in 2009. He was appointed an Assistant Recorder in 1993, a Recorder in 1997, a […]
-
July 27, 2020
Court of Appeal: Retirement of Lady Justice Rafferty DBE
Lady Justice Rafferty DBE retires as Lady Justice of Appeal with effect from 27 July 2020. Notes to editors Dame Anne Judith Rafferty DBE (70) was called to the Bar (G) in 1973, took Silk in 1990 and was elected a Bencher in 1998. She was appointed a Recorder in 1991, a Deputy High Court […]
-
July 18, 2020
District Judge (Magistrates’ courts) Retirement: Davison
District Judge (Magistrates’ courts) Neil Davison retires with effect from 18 July 2020. Notes to editors District Judge (Magistrates’ courts) Davison (69) was admitted as a Solicitor in 1977. He was appointed a Deputy District Judge (Magistrates’ courts) in 1999 and a District Judge (Magistrates’ courts) in 2005.
-
July 11, 2020
Circuit Bench Retirement: Challinor
His Honour Judge Michael Challinor retires as a Circuit Judge with effect from 11 July 2020. Notes to editors His Honour Judge Challinor (70) was called to the Bar (G) in 1974. He was appointed an Assistant Recorder in 1991, a Recorder in 1997 and a Circuit Judge in 2004. He was a Criminal Course […]
-
July 10, 2020
Circuit Bench Retirement: Durham Hall QC
His Honour Judge Jonathan David Durham Hall QC retires as a Circuit Judge with effect from 10 July 2020. Notes to editors His Honour Judge Durham Hall QC (68) was called to the Bar (G) in 1975 and took Silk in 1995. He was appointed an Assistant Recorder in 1991, a Recorder in 1995, a […]
-
July 6, 2020
District Bench Retirement: Carson
District Judge Graham Henry Fergus Carson retires from the District Bench with effect from 6 July 2020. Notes to editors District Judge Carson (65) was admitted as a Solicitor in 1978. He was appointed a Deputy District Judge in 1991 and a District Judge in 1999.
-
July 4, 2020
Circuit Bench Retirement: Williams DL
Her Honour Judge Jean Adele Williams DL retires as a Circuit Judge with effect from 4 July 2020. Notes to editors Her Honour Judge Williams DL (69) was called to the Bar (G) in 1972. She was appointed a Recorder in 1995 and a Circuit Judge in 2000. She was the Resident Judge, Canterbury Crown […]