Retirement
-
October 1, 2019
District Judge (Magistrates’ Courtss) Retirement: Coleman
District Judge (Magistrates’ Courtss) Margot Valerie Coleman retires with effect from 1 October 2019. Notes to editors District Judge (Magistrates’ Courtss) Coleman (65) was admitted as a Solicitor in 1978. She was appointed a Deputy District Judge (Magistrates’ Courtss) in 2000 and a District Judge (Magistrates’ Courtss) in 2005.
-
October 1, 2019
Employment Judge Retirement: Keevash
Employment Judge Stephen Keevash retires with effect from 1 October 2019. Notes to editors Employment Judge Keevash (69) was admitted as a Solicitor in 1975. He was appointed a part-time Chairman of Employment Tribunals in 1995, an Employment Judge in 1998 and a Legal Chairman of the Reserve Forces Appeal Tribunal in 2003.
-
October 1, 2019
Employment Judge Retirement: Garvie
Employment Judge Jane Garvie retires with effect from 1 October 2019. Notes to editors Employment Judge Garvie (63) was admitted as a Solicitor (Scotland) in 1981 and England and Wales in 1992. She was appointed a part-time Chairman of Employment Tribunals in 2002 and a salaried Employment Judge the same year (formerly known as Chairman […]
-
October 1, 2019
Circuit Bench Retirement: Devaux DL
His Honour Judge John Edward Devaux DL retires as a Circuit Judge with effect from 1 October 2019. Notes to editors His Honour Judge Devaux DL (72) was called to the Bar (L) in 1970. He was appointed an Assistant Recorder 1984, a Recorder in 1989 and a Circuit Judge in 1993. He was Resident […]
-
September 29, 2019
High Court: Retirement of The Honourable Sir Paul James Walker
The Honourable Sir Paul James Walker retires from the High Court (Queen’s Bench) with effect from 29 September 2019. Notes to editors Sir Paul Walker (65) was called to the Bar (G) in 1979, took Silk in 1999 and elected a Bencher in 2005. He was appointed a Recorder in 2002 and a Judge of […]
-
September 25, 2019
Circuit Bench Retirement: Davies QC
His Honour Judge David Owen Handel Davies QC retired as a Circuit Judge with effect from 23 September 2019. Notes to editors His Honour Judge Davies QC (70) was called to the Bar (I) in 1973, was Head of Chambers at Garden Court Chambers from 1991 to 2011 and took Silk in 1999. He was […]
-
September 24, 2019
Circuit Bench Retirement: Heywood
His Honour Judge Peter Leslie Heywood retires as a Circuit Judge with effect from 24 September 2019. Notes to editors His Honour Judge Heywood (70) was called to the Bar (G) in 1988. He was appointed a Recorder in 2003 and a Circuit Judge in 2008.
-
September 19, 2019
High Court: Retirement of The Honourable Sir Gerald Edward Barling
The Honourable Sir Gerald Edward Barling retires from the High Court (Chancery) with effect from 19 September 2019. Notes to editors Sir Gerald Barling (70) was called to the Bar (M) in 1972 (NI Bar 1992), took Silk in 1991 (NI 1992) and elected a Bencher in 2001. He was appointed an Assistant Recorder in […]
-
September 6, 2019
District Bench Retirement: Llewellyn OBE
District Judge Peter Huw Llewellyn OBE retires from the District Bench with effect from 6 September 2019. Notes to editors District Judge Llewellyn OBE (70) was admitted as a Solicitor in 1976. He was appointed a Deputy District Judge in 1991 and a District Judge in 1998.
-
September 6, 2019
Senior Circuit Judge Retirement: Bourne-Arton QC
His Honour Judge Simon Nicholas Bourne-Arton QC retires as a Senior Circuit Judge with effect from 6 September 2019. Notes to editors His Honour Judge Bourne-Arton QC (70) was called to the Bar (I) in 1975, took Silk in 1994 and elected as a Bencher in 2003. He was appointed an Assistant Recorder in 1989, […]