Appointments & Retirements
-
May 5, 2022
Appointment of Resident Judges
Following Expressions of Interest exercises, the Lord Chief Justice is pleased to announce the appointment of two Resident Judges. HHJ Bill Mousley QC has been appointed as the Resident Judge at Bournemouth Combined Court with effect from 3 May 2022. HHJ James Townsend has been appointed as the Resident Judge at Swindon Combined […]
-
May 4, 2022
District Bench Retirement: Ball
District Judge Mark St Clair Ball retires from the District Bench with effect from 4 May 2022. Background information District Judge Ball (66) was admitted as a Solicitor in 1981. He was appointed a Deputy District Judge in 1993 and a District Judge in 2012.
-
May 3, 2022
District Bench Retirement: Wright
District Judge Martin Andrew Wright retired from the District Bench with effect from 1 May 2022. Background information District Judge Wright (69) was admitted as a Solicitor in 1978 and called to the Bar (Middle Temple) in 2004. He was appointed a Lawyer Chairman of the Rent Assessment Panel in 1997, a Deputy District Judge […]
-
May 3, 2022
District Judge (Magistrates’ Courts) Retirement: Brown
District Judge (Magistrates’ Courts) Martin Brown retired with effect from 30 April 2022. Background information District Judge (Magistrates’ Courts) Brown (63) was admitted as a Solicitor in 1982. He was appointed as an Acting Provincial Stipendiary Magistrate in 1999 and a District Judge (Magistrates’ Courts) in 2005. He was Director of the Youth Court Course […]
-
May 3, 2022
District Judge (Magistrates’ Courts) Retirement: Nicholls
District Judge (Magistrates’ Courts) Stephen John Nicholls retired with effect from 1 May 2022. Background information District Judge (Magistrates’ Courts) Nicholls (65) was admitted as a Solicitor in 1981. He was appointed as a Deputy District Judge (Magistrates’ Courts) in 2000, as Assistant Coroner for Dorset in 2009 and a District Judge (Magistrates’ Courts) in […]
-
May 3, 2022
Employment Judge Retirement: Christensen
Employment Judge Christa Marie Christensen retired with effect from 1 May 2022. Background information Employment Judge Christensen (62) was admitted as a Solicitor in 1984. She was appointed a part-time Chairman of Employment Tribunals in 1995 and a Salaried Employment Judge in 2003. She was appointed Director of Training for Tribunals at the Judicial College […]
-
May 3, 2022
Circuit Bench Retirement: Mellanby
Her Honour Judge Carolyn Ann Fitzherbert Mellanby retired as a Circuit Judge with effect from 1 May 2022. Background information Her Honour Judge Mellanby (70) was called to the Bar (Gray’s Inn) in 1975 and admitted as a Solicitor in 1990. She was appointed as a Magistrate (Seychelles) in 1982, an Acting Stipendiary Magistrate in […]
-
May 3, 2022
Circuit Bench Retirement: Crabtree OBE
His Honour Judge Peter Dixon Crabtree OBE retired as a Circuit Judge with effect from 30 April 2022. Background information His Honour Judge Crabtree OBE (66) was called to the Bar (Gray’s Inn) in 1985. He was appointed a Deputy District Judge (Magistrates’ Courts) in 2003, a District Judge (Magistrates’ Courts) in 2005, a Recorder […]
-
May 3, 2022
Circuit Bench Retirement: Cahill QC
Her Honour Judge Sally Elizabeth Mary Cahill QC retired as a Circuit Judge with effect from 30 April 2022. Background information Her Honour Judge Cahill QC (66) was called to the Bar (Gray’s Inn) in 1978 and took Silk in 2003. She was appointed an Assistant Recorder in 1997, a Recorder in 2000 and a […]
-
April 27, 2022
Appointment as Chamber President of the First-tier Tribunal, General Regulatory Chamber: O’Connor
Judge Mark O’Connor has been appointed as Chamber President of the First-tier Tribunal, General Regulatory Chamber, by the Senior President of Tribunals, the Right Honourable Sir Keith Lindblom with effect from 27 April 2022. Notes to editor Mark O’Connor, aged 50, will be known as Judge O’Connor. He was called to the Bar (I) in […]